+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On January 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On October 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On August 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Representative Allen added as a cosponsor
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs
- Introduced by Senators Kooyenga and Olsen; cosponsored by Representatives Zimmerman, Kulp, Brandtjen, Kuglitsch, Spiros and Knodl
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor