+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On December 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Published 12-13-2013
- Report approved by the Governor on 12-12-2013. 2013 Wisconsin Act 80
On December 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 12-10-2013
On December 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
On November 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On November 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On November 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read a second time
- Senate Substitute Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author
- Senate Substitute Amendment 2 adopted
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed, Ayes 20, Noes 13
- Ordered immediately messaged
On November 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Rules suspended
- Placed on the calendar of 11-12-2013 following Assembly Bill 460
- Placed at the foot of the calendar of 11-12-2013
- Read a second time
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 59, Noes 35
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read first time and referred to calendar of 11-12-2013
On November 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cowles
- Senate Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Senator Cowles
- Placed on calendar 11-12-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Economic Development and Local Government, Ayes 3, Noes 2
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development and Local Government
- Introduced by Senators Tiffany, Moulton and Grothman; cosponsored by Representatives Mursau, Swearingen, Bies, Bernier, Brooks, Czaja, Endsley, Kestell, Krug, LeMahieu, Severson, Stroebel and Jacque
+ − Amendments (2)
Senate Substitute Amendment 2
Senate Substitute Amendment 2 adopted
Senate Substitute Amendment 1
Senate Substitute Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author
+ − Votes (2)
November 12, 2013: Read a third time and concurred in
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 35
November 12, 2013: Read a third time and passed
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor