+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On December 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Published 12-17-2015
- Report approved by the Governor on 12-16-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 121
On December 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 12-14-2015
On December 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
On November 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On November 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Representative Meyers added as a cosponsor
- Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 91, Noes 1
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On November 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to calendar of 11-16-2015 pursuant to Assembly Rule 93
On November 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On November 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed
On November 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator C. Larson added as a coauthor
- Placed on calendar 11-6-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On October 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On October 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On October 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On September 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Representative Heaton added as a cosponsor
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
- Introduced by Senators LeMahieu, Lassa, Harris Dodd, Marklein and Olsen; cosponsored by Representatives Kerkman, Goyke, Berceau, Bowen, E. Brooks, Edming, Genrich, Horlacher, Jacque, Johnson, Kahl, Krug, Kulp, T. Larson, Murphy, Mursau, Ohnstad, A. Ott, Quinn, Rohrkaste, Sargent, Sinicki, Spiros, Spreitzer, Subeck, C. Taylor, Thiesfeldt, Tittl, Zamarripa and Kremer
+ − Vote
November 16, 2015: Read a third time and concurred in
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor