+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Laid on table
- Read a second time
- Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 5-11-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Felzkowski
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Felzkowski
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Insurance, Licensing and Forestry, Ayes 4, Noes 0
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Licensing and Forestry
- Introduced by Senators Felzkowski, Ballweg, Bewley, Cowles, Jacque, Marklein and Nass; cosponsored by Representatives Magnafici, Armstrong, Brooks, Cabral-Guevara, Callahan, Dittrich, Doyle, Edming, James, Knodl, Milroy, Moses, Murphy, Neylon, Novak, Oldenburg, Petryk, Plumer, Ramthun, Rozar, Skowronski, Spiros, Tauchen, Thiesfeldt and Wichgers
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor