+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 11, Noes 4
- Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 11, Noes 4
- Executive action taken
- Available for scheduling
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Representative Kurtz added as a cosponsor
On January 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Representative Moses added as a cosponsor
- Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c)
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Representatives Sortwell and Callahan added as cosponsors
On October 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 4, Noes 1
- Executive action taken
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 3, Noes 2
- Available for scheduling
On August 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Roth
On August 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Penterman added as a cosponsor
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Allen added as a cosponsor
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senator Stafsholt added as a coauthor
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Loudenbeck added as a cosponsor
On April 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Knodl added as a cosponsor
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Edming added as a cosponsor
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform
- Introduced by Senators Roth, Stroebel, Cowles, Darling, Jacque and Kooyenga; cosponsored by Representatives J. Rodriguez, Dittrich, Born, Armstrong, Dallman, James, Kitchens, Kuglitsch, Macco, Magnafici, Murphy, Rozar, Skowronski, Spiros, Summerfield, Tauchen, Tittl, Tranel, Vorpagel, Wichgers, Wittke, Zimmerman and Schraa
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor