+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Laid on table
- Representative Bowen added as a cosponsor
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Ohnstad added as a cosponsor
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 3-16-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Insurance, Licensing and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Insurance, Licensing and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative McGuire added as a cosponsor
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Brostoff added as a cosponsor
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor
- Fiscal estimate received
- Public hearing held
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Kapenga
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Licensing and Forestry
- Introduced by Senator Wanggaard; cosponsored by Representative Kerkman
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor