+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On November 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Published 11-28-2017
- Report approved by the Governor on 11-27-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 65
On November 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 11-22-2017
On November 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
On November 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On November 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On November 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 11-7-2017 by Committee on Rules
On June 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read a second time
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed
- Ordered immediately messaged
On June 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On June 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 6-14-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On June 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Representative Bernier added as a cosponsor
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection
- Introduced by Senators Moulton, Marklein, Kapenga, Nass and Stroebel; cosponsored by Representatives Kulp, Krug, Kremer, Steffen, Ripp, Ballweg, Knodl, E. Brooks, Skowronski and R. Brooks
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor