+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Published 4-9-2014
- Report approved by the Governor on 4-8-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 234
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 4-7-2014
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
On January 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 98, Noes 0
- Representative Hesselbein added as a cosponsor
- Ordered immediately messaged
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On January 16, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 1-21-2014 by Committee on Rules
On October 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
On October 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On October 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 18, Noes 15
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Erpenbach
- Read a second time
- Read a third time and passed, Ayes 33, Noes 0
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Ordered immediately messaged
On October 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 10-15-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
- Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Referred to Joint Committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Energy, Consumer Protection, and Government Reform, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Executive action taken
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Energy, Consumer Protection, and Government Reform
- Introduced by Senators Tiffany, Cowles, Olsen, Gudex, Petrowski and Harsdorf; cosponsored by Representatives Ripp, Marklein, Jagler, Brooks, Bies, T. Larson, Bernier, Murphy, Mursau, Czaja, Endsley, Sinicki, Strachota, Hintz, A. Ott, Ohnstad, Spiros, Tranel, Jacque and Tittl
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment 1
Senate Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 18, Noes 15
+ − Votes (3)
January 21, 2014: Read a third time and concurred in
- Yeas: 98
October 15, 2013: Senate Amendment 1 laid on table
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 15
October 15, 2013: Read a third time and passed
- Yeas: 33
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor