+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c)
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Trade, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Trade, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Feyen
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
- Fiscal estimate received
- Public hearing held
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Trade
- Introduced by Senators Feyen, Darling and Wanggaard; cosponsored by Representatives Rohrkaste, Gundrum, Kulp and Ramthun