+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Laid on table
- Senator Miller added as a coauthor
- Rules suspended
- Placed at the foot of the calendar of 5-14-2013
- Read a second time
- Senator Vinehout added as a coauthor
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Placed on calendar 5-14-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Executive action taken
- Public hearing held
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator S. Fitzgerald
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs
- Introduced by Senators S. Fitzgerald, L. Taylor, Gudex, Tiffany, Grothman, Darling, Carpenter, Lasee, Lazich and Lassa; cosponsored by Representatives Born, Jagler, Kleefisch, Ripp, Nass, Marklein, Brooks, Tranel, Petersen, Jacque, Sanfelippo, Strachota, Petryk, Czaja, Ohnstad, Honadel, Pridemore, Kolste, Hesselbein, Murphy, Weatherston, Jorgensen, Thiesfeldt, Tittl, Craig, Spiros, Bernier, Endsley, Schraa, Kahl, T. Larson, Kestell, Bies and Suder
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment 1
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor