+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Representative A. Ott added as a cosponsor
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Executive action taken
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs
- Introduced by Senators Petrowski, Bewley, Carpenter, Cowles, Gudex, Marklein and Olsen; cosponsored by Representatives Spiros, Berceau, Billings, E. Brooks, Edming, Kahl, Kessler, Krug, Kulp, T. Larson, Murphy, Ohnstad, Petryk, Quinn, Spreitzer and Subeck
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor