+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Representative Considine added as a cosponsor
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Representative McGuire added as a cosponsor
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Representative Pope added as a cosponsor
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Representative Vruwink added as a cosponsor
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 14, Noes 18
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Representative Ramthun added as a cosponsor
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Representative Spreitzer added as a cosponsor
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions
- Introduced by Senators Stroebel, Roth, Bernier, Marklein, Olsen, Petrowski, Wanggaard, Kooyenga, Cowles, LeMahieu, Smith, Carpenter, Ringhand, Miller, Hansen, Wirch, Shilling, Larson, Bewley and Erpenbach; cosponsored by Representatives Brooks, Steffen, Krug, Tittl, Edming, Gundrum, Kerkman, Mursau, Quinn, Rodriguez, Schraa, Tauchen, Kuglitsch, Spiros, Novak, Kolste, Hintz, Crowley, Anderson, Stuck, Sargent, Subeck, Doyle, Goyke, Zamarripa, Hesselbein, C. Taylor, Riemer, Ohnstad, Shankland, Billings, Neubauer, Katsma and Ott
+ − Vote
May 15, 2019: Refused to withdraw from committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 18
+ − Sponsors (54)
Type:
Primary Sponsor