+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On November 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report approved by the Governor on 11-11-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 110
- Published 11-12-2015
On November 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 11-10-2015
On November 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
On November 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On November 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
On October 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 11-3-2015 by Committee on Rules
On October 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Senate Amendment 1 adopted
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed
On June 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 6-9-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Elections and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Elections and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator LeMahieu
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Elections and Local Government
- Introduced by Senators LeMahieu and Lassa; cosponsored by Representatives Katsma, Kooyenga, Horlacher, R. Brooks, Ballweg, E. Brooks, Spreitzer, Kulp, Edming and Kahl
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor