+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On June 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Published 6-23-2021
- Report approved by the Governor on 6-22-2021. 2021 Wisconsin Act 50
On June 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 6-22-2021
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
On June 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Ordered immediately messaged
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On June 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Representatives Vining and Subeck added as cosponsors
On June 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 6-16-2021 by Committee on Rules
On June 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
On May 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor
On May 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Representative Drake added as a cosponsor
On May 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Representative L. Myers added as a cosponsor
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed, Ayes 33, Noes 0
On May 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 5-11-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0
- Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wanggaard
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Shelton added as a cosponsor
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Bowen added as a cosponsor
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Brostoff added as a cosponsor
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
- Introduced by Senators Wanggaard, L. Taylor, Darling, Cowles, Feyen, Jacque and Roys; cosponsored by Representatives Spiros, Armstrong, Brandtjen, Brooks, Cabrera, Moses, Rozar, Thiesfeldt and Wichgers
+ − Amendment
2021 SSA1-SB123
- Relating to: reporting of law enforcement use-of-force incidents.
+ − Vote
May 11, 2021: Read a third time and passed
- Yeas: 33
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor