+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On March 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On December 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
On March 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and passed
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Senate Amendment 1 adopted
- Read a second time
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 3-23-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
- Introduced by Senators Jacque, Cowles and Stroebel; cosponsored by Representatives Krug, Armstrong, Edming, Horlacher, Kitchens, Moses, Murphy, Mursau, Rozar, Thiesfeldt and Tusler
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor