+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Published 2-5-2016
- Report approved by the Governor on 2-4-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 146
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor on 2-3-2016
- Report correctly enrolled
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On January 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
On January 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 1-19-2016 by Committee on Rules
On December 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
On September 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On September 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On September 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed
- Ordered immediately messaged
On September 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 9-16-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Elections and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Elections and Local Government
- Introduced by Senator Bewley; cosponsored by Representative Meyers
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor