+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 3-29-2016
On March 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Concurred in
- Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 3-15-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
- Senator Miller added as a cosponsor
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization
- Received from Assembly
On February 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Adopted
- Representative Barca added as a coauthor
On February 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 2-16-2016 by Committee on Rules
On January 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read and referred to Committee on Rules
- Introduced by Representatives Steffen, Nygren, Ballweg, E. Brooks, Genrich, Goyke, Kahl, Murphy, A. Ott, Pope, Rohrkaste, Sinicki, Skowronski, Subeck and Hutton; cosponsored by Senators Cowles, Hansen, C. Larson, Lasee, Petrowski, Ringhand, L. Taylor and Vukmir
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor