+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 3-24-2014
On March 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Concurred in
- Senator Hansen added as a cosponsor
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 3-18-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On February 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Adopted
On February 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 2-20-2014 by Committee on Rules
On February 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read and referred to Committee on Rules
- Introduced by Representatives Ballweg, Vos and Barca; cosponsored by Senators Olsen, Ellis and C. Larson
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor