+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On October 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization
On October 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On October 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Adopted
On October 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 10-10-2019 by Committee on Rules
On October 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read and referred to Committee on Rules
- Introduced by Representative Vos; cosponsored by Senator Fitzgerald
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor