+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 1, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On October 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Laid on the table
On October 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Representative Pronschinske added as a coauthor
On October 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Representative Swearingen added as a coauthor
- Placed on calendar 10-10-2019 by Committee on Rules
On October 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Representatives Jagler and Ramthun added as coauthors
On October 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read and referred to Committee on Rules
- Introduced by Representatives Kurtz, Skowronski, VanderMeer, Allen, Petryk, Edming, Summerfield, James, Plumer, Dittrich, Ballweg, Tittl and Ott; cosponsored by Senators Fitzgerald, Miller, Roth, Marklein and Kooyenga
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor