+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On October 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization
On October 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On October 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Adopted
On October 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 10-10-2019 by Committee on Rules
- Representative Zamarripa added as a coauthor
On September 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Representative Tusler added as a coauthor
On August 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read and referred to Committee on Rules
- Introduced by Representatives Nygren, Felzkowski, Rohrkaste, Allen, Swearingen, Tauchen, Loudenbeck, Sinicki, Magnafici, Spiros, Spreitzer, Petryk, James, Milroy, Sargent, Mursau, Dittrich, Plumer, Shankland, Bowen, Kolste, Horlacher, Ohnstad, Ramthun, Thiesfeldt and Steineke; cosponsored by Senators Testin, Wanggaard, Miller, Risser, Cowles, Marklein, Jacque, Hansen, Bernier and Schachtner
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor