+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On January 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 1-29-2018
On January 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Senator Hansen added as a cosponsor
- Concurred in
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 1-23-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On November 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization
On November 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On November 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Representatives Thiesfeldt, Murphy and Barca added as coauthors
- Adopted
On October 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 11-2-2017 by Committee on Rules
On October 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Representative Pronschinske added as a coauthor
On October 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read and referred to Committee on Rules
- Introduced by Representatives Hintz, Schraa, Rohrkaste, Kitchens, Spreitzer, Vruwink, C. Taylor, Hebl, Steffen, Ballweg, Crowley, Considine, Brostoff, Horlacher, Mursau, Berceau, Hesselbein, Fields, Kessler, Tittl, Subeck, Spiros, Tusler, Knodl, Genrich, Vorpagel, Zepnick and E. Brooks; cosponsored by Senators Feyen, Lasee, Marklein, Olsen, L. Taylor, Roth, Wanggaard, Vukmir and Ringhand
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor