+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On November 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 11-18-2015
On November 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On November 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Concurred in
On November 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 11-6-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On October 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization
On October 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On October 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Adopted
On October 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 10-27-2015 by Committee on Rules
On October 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read and referred to Committee on Rules
- Introduced by Representatives Tittl, Vorpagel, Allen, Brandtjen, E. Brooks, Hebl, Kessler, Kitchens, Kleefisch, Knodl, Kolste, Krug, Milroy, Murphy, Mursau, A. Ott, Petryk, Pope, Rohrkaste, Sinicki, Spiros, Subeck and C. Taylor; cosponsored by Senators Harsdorf, Cowles, Olsen, Petrowski, Vukmir, Wanggaard, Bewley, Hansen, Lassa, L. Taylor and Wirch
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor