+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 3
- Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 3-4-2013
On February 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 2-26-2013
On February 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Concurred in
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 2-20-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On February 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Adopted
- Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up
On February 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read and referred to Committee on Rules
- Introduced by Representative Murtha; cosponsored by Senator Harsdorf
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor