+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 18
- Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 4-11-2014
On November 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 11-15-2013
On November 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On November 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- C. Larson, Darling, Ellis, Erpenbach, Farrow, Gudex, Harris, Harsdorf, Jauch, Kedzie, Leibham, Miller, Moulton, Olsen, Petrowski, S. Fitzgerald, Schultz, Shilling, Tiffany, Vukmir and Wirch of the Senate added as cosponsors
- Concurred in by unanimous rising vote
- Read
On November 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 11-12-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On November 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
- Available for scheduling
- Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization
On November 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- August, Ballweg, Barnes, Bernier, Bewley, Billings, Born, Brooks, C. Taylor, Clark, Craig, Czaja, Endsley, Hebl, Hesselbein, Hintz, Hutton, J. Ott, Jagler, Johnson, Jorgensen, Kahl, Kapenga, Kaufert, Kerkman, Kessler, Kestell, Kleefisch, Klenke, Knodl, Knudson, Kolste, Kooyenga, Kramer, Kuglitsch, LeMahieu, Loudenbeck, Marklein, Mason, Murphy, Mursau, Murtha, Nass, Nerison, Neylon, Nygren, Pasch, Petersen, Petryk, Pope, Pridemore, Richards, Riemer, Ringhand, Ripp, Sanfelippo, Schraa, Severson, Shankland, Sinicki, Smith, Spiros, Steineke, Strachota, Stroebel, Swearingen, T. Larson, Tauchen, Thiesfeldt, Tranel, Vos, Vruwink, Wachs, Weatherston, Williams, Wright, Zamarripa and Zepnick of the Assembly added as coauthors
- Adopted
- LRB correction
On October 31, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 11-5-2013 by Committee on Rules
On October 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read and referred to Committee on Rules
- Introduced by Representatives Barca, Weininger, Bies, Sargent, Hulsey, Genrich, Doyle, Berceau, Milroy, Bernard Schaber, Goyke, Tittl, Young, Danou, Jacque, Ohnstad, Krug and A. Ott; cosponsored by Senators Hansen, Risser, Carpenter, Lehman, Cowles, L. Taylor, Vinehout, T. Cullen, Lassa, Lasee, Lazich and Grothman
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor