+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization
On November 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On November 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Adopted
- Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
On November 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 11-11-2021 by Committee on Rules
On June 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read and referred to Committee on Rules
- Introduced by Representatives Hebl, Hong, Anderson, Baldeh, Bowen, Conley, Drake, Hesselbein, Pope, S. Rodriguez, Sinicki, Stubbs, Subeck, Tusler and Vruwink; cosponsored by Senators Roys, Agard and L. Taylor
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor