+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On June 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Representative Schraa added as a coauthor
On June 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Representatives Tusler, Spiros and Callahan added as coauthors
On June 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Representatives Baldeh, Kurtz and Wittke added as coauthors
On June 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read and referred to calendar
- Introduced by Representatives Duchow, Knodl, Vos, Vorpagel, Dallman, Dittrich, Edming, Gundrum, Kerkman, Kitchens, Krug, Kuglitsch, Magnafici, Moses, Murphy, Novak, Plumer, Steffen, Thiesfeldt, Tittl, Tranel, Stubbs, Anderson, Drake, Hebl, Sinicki, Subeck and Vruwink; cosponsored by Senators Darling, Ballweg, Feyen, Marklein, Carpenter, Erpenbach and L. Taylor
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor