+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On February 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Representative Thiesfeldt added as a coauthor
- Adopted
On February 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 2-20-2018 by Committee on Rules
On May 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read and referred to Committee on Rules
- Introduced by Representatives Crowley, Kleefisch, Horlacher, Zamarripa, Zepnick, Loudenbeck, Kessler, Kolste, Tusler, Tittl, Riemer, Ballweg, C. Taylor, Pope, Hintz, Bernier, Hesselbein, Anderson, Genrich, Fields, Berceau, Vruwink, Spreitzer, Murphy, Subeck, Brostoff, Considine and Ohnstad; cosponsored by Senators Wirch, Darling, L. Taylor, Harsdorf, Ringhand, Johnson, Vinehout and Olsen
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor