+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 1, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On June 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Representative Zamarripa added as a coauthor
- Laid on the table
On June 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 6-18-2019 by Committee on Rules
On June 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Representative Schraa added as a coauthor
On June 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read and referred to Committee on Rules
- Introduced by Representatives James, Skowronski, Allen, Anderson, Ballweg, Duchow, Kurtz, Magnafici, Milroy, Plumer, Pronschinske, Rodriguez, Rohrkaste, Sinicki, Snyder, Spreitzer, Thiesfeldt, Tusler, VanderMeer, Zimmerman and Horlacher; cosponsored by Senators Kooyenga, Marklein, Bernier, Carpenter, Petrowski, L. Taylor, Wanggaard and Wirch
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor