+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 6-23-2017
On June 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Concurred in
On June 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 6-14-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization
- Received from Assembly
On May 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Adopted
On May 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 5-10-2017 by Committee on Rules
On May 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read and referred to Committee on Rules
- Introduced by Representatives Horlacher, Vruwink, Rodriguez, Spreitzer, Berceau, Crowley, Murphy, Pope, Sinicki, Skowronski and Spiros; cosponsored by Senators Nass, Ringhand and Bewley
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor