+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 1, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On May 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Laid on the table
On May 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor
On May 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 5-15-2019 by Committee on Rules
On May 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read and referred to Committee on Rules
- Introduced by Representatives Oldenburg, Edming, Horlacher, Kulp, Kurtz, Loudenbeck, Petryk, Schraa, Spreitzer, Tauchen, Thiesfeldt, Tranel, VanderMeer and Pronschinske; cosponsored by Senators Marklein, Carpenter, Nass, Ringhand and Smith
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor