+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 13
- Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 7-10-2013
On June 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 6-14-2013
On June 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- C. Larson, Carpenter, Darling, Ellis, Erpenbach, Farrow, Grothman, Gudex, Hansen, Harris, Harsdorf, Jauch, Kedzie, L. Taylor, Lasee, Lassa, Lazich, Lehman, Leibham, Miller, Moulton, Olsen, Petrowski, Risser, S. Fitzgerald, Schultz, Shilling, T. Cullen, Tiffany, Vinehout, Vukmir and Wirch of the Senate added as cosponsors
- Concurred in
- Read
On June 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 6-11-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On May 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Adopted
On May 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 5-14-2013 by Committee on Rules
- Read and referred to Committee on Rules
- Introduced by Representatives Steineke and Nygren; cosponsored by Senator Cowles
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor