+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On October 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization
On October 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On October 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Adopted
On October 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 10-20-2015 by Committee on Rules
On May 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read and referred to Committee on Rules
- Introduced by Representatives Barca, Sargent, Hebl, Subeck, Goyke, Considine, Ohnstad, Sinicki, Berceau and C. Taylor; cosponsored by Senators L. Taylor, Wirch, Nass, Wanggaard and Vukmir
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor