+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On November 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 11-18-2015
On November 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On November 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Senator Hansen added as a cosponsor
- Concurred in
On November 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 11-6-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On February 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Adopted
On February 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 2-12-2015 by Committee on Rules
On January 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read and referred to Committee on Rules
- Introduced by Representatives Ohnstad, Barca, Berceau, Brostoff, Considine, Goyke, Horlacher, Kahl, Kolste, Pope, Quinn, Sargent, Spreitzer, Subeck, Young, Zamarripa, Thiesfeldt, Jorgensen, Bowen and Wachs; cosponsored by Senators L. Taylor, Erpenbach, Harris Dodd, Olsen, Ringhand and Vinehout
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor