+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On February 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Adopted
- Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
On February 17, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Representative Tusler added as a coauthor
On February 13, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 2-18-2020 by Committee on Rules
On February 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read and referred to Committee on Rules
- Introduced by Representatives Steineke, L. Myers, Mursau, Pronschinske, Sinicki, Hintz, C. Taylor, Skowronski, Bowen, Hebl, Milroy, Gruszynski, Kolste, Vruwink, Subeck, Krug, Tauchen, Sargent, Pope, Spiros, Spreitzer, Ohnstad, Anderson and Brostoff; cosponsored by Senators Cowles, Roth, Carpenter, Hansen, Larson, Risser and Ringhand
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor