+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization
- Received from Assembly
On February 20, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Adopted
On February 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 2-20-2020 by Committee on Rules
On January 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read and referred to Committee on Rules
- Introduced by Representatives Allen, Tauchen, Magnafici, Anderson, Sinicki, Steffen, Spreitzer, Subeck, Tusler, C. Taylor, Skowronski and Spiros; cosponsored by Senators Risser and Olsen
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor