+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization
- Received from Assembly
On February 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Adopted
On February 13, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 2-18-2020 by Committee on Rules
On January 28, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read and referred to Committee on Rules
- Introduced by Representatives Thiesfeldt, Kitchens, Krug, Skowronski, Spiros, Spreitzer, Subeck, Tranel, Tusler, Vorpagel and Vruwink; cosponsored by Senators Olsen, Bewley, Larson and Nass
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor