+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed at the foot of the calendar of 2-20-2020
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 2-19-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On January 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Representative Quinn added as a coauthor
- Adopted
On January 16, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 1-21-2020 by Committee on Rules
- Read and referred to Committee on Rules
- Introduced by Representatives Edming and B. Meyers; cosponsored by Senators Petrowski and Bewley