+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 5-17-2022 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a)
- Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
On April 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Report vetoed by the Governor on 4-15-2022
On April 13, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Presented to the Governor on 4-13-2022
On March 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 3-10-2022
On March 9, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 20, Noes 11
- Ordered immediately messaged
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 3-8-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
- Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
- Available for scheduling
- Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 4, Noes 3
- Executive action taken
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Education
On February 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Emerson, Anderson, Andraca, Baldeh, Billings, Brostoff, Conley, Considine, Doyle, Goyke, Hebl, Hong, McGuire, B. Meyers, Moore Omokunde, Neubauer, Ohnstad, Pope, S. Rodriguez, Shankland, Shelton, Sinicki, Snodgrass, Spreitzer, Subeck, Vining, Vruwink and Haywood
- Read a second time
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended to return to amendable stage
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 60, Noes 33
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed, Ayes 59, Noes 34, Paired 2
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On February 21, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Representative Steffen added as a coauthor
On February 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 by Committee on Rules
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 7, Noes 6
- Executive action taken
On February 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
- Fiscal estimate received
On February 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor
On February 8, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced by Representatives Wittke, Thiesfeldt, Dittrich, Murphy, Penterman, Moses, Rozar, Brandtjen, Macco, Knodl and Magnafici; cosponsored by Senators Roth, Darling, Nass, Wanggaard, Stroebel and Jagler
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 8, 2022: Read a third time and concurred in
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 11
February 22, 2022: Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 33
February 22, 2022: Read a third time and passed, Paired 2
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 34
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor