+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On June 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Laid on the table
On June 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 6-16-2021 by Committee on Rules
On June 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 14, Noes 0
On April 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced by Representatives Steffen, Macco, Shelton, Baldeh, Bowen, Brandtjen, Cabrera, Dittrich, Edming, Gundrum, Jagler, Kitchens, Kuglitsch, Milroy, Moses, Murphy, Mursau, Ramthun, Shankland, Sinicki, Snyder, Spreitzer, Tauchen, Thiesfeldt, Tittl, Tranel, Tusler, Vorpagel, Vruwink, Spiros and Petryk; cosponsored by Senators Wimberger, Cowles, Jacque, Carpenter and Marklein
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor