+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On November 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On November 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Revived by the committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 93 (1), Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on Senate Organization
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 3-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
- Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
- Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2
- Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- LRB correction (Assembly Substitute Amendment 1)
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On February 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 59, Noes 34
- Read a second time
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Stuck, Barca, Berceau, Billings, Considine, Genrich, Hebl, Hesselbein, Hintz, Kessler, Meyers, Ohnstad, Pope, Riemer, Shankland, Subeck, Wachs and Zamarripa
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a third time and passed, Ayes 56, Noes 37
- Ordered immediately messaged
On February 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author
On February 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Made a special order of business at 1:39 PM on 2-22-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 27
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Petersen
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 9, Noes 5
- Executive action taken
- Public hearing held
On February 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
- Fiscal estimate received
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs
- Introduced by Representatives Steineke, Rohrkaste, Murphy, Tusler, Spiros and Petersen; cosponsored by Senator Roth
+ − Amendments (2)
2017 ASA1-AB963
- Relating to: revolving loan funds administered by the Wisconsin Housing and Economic Development Authority for certain activities of paper mills and making an appropriation.
+ − Votes (2)
February 22, 2018: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 34
February 22, 2018: Read a third time and passed
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 37