+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor
- Laid on the table
On February 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Made a special order of business at 9:15 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29
On February 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 13, Noes 0
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 13, Noes 0
On February 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On February 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Steineke
On February 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On February 7, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Representative Jacque added as a cosponsor
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced by Representative Steineke; cosponsored by Senator Cowles
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor