+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Mursau
On February 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On February 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kooyenga
On February 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On February 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Kooyenga and Fields
On February 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight
- Introduced by Representatives Kooyenga and Fields; cosponsored by Senators Wanggaard and L. Taylor
+ − Amendments (3)
2017 ASA1-AB923
- Relating to: increasing the authority of a county executive from a populous county and other counties and reducing the authority of a county board, and budgeting procedures for populous counties and certain other counties.