+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Printed engrossed by the direction of the Senate Chief Clerk-5575
- LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 5)
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On February 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representatives C. Taylor, Billings, Considine, Crowley, Hebl, Kessler, Kolste, Neubauer, Pope, Riemer, Sargent, Shankland, Sinicki, Spreitzer and Zamarripa
- Assembly Amendment 4 offered by Representative Zimmerman
- Assembly Amendment 5 offered by Representative Zimmerman
- Read a second time
- Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
- Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 60, Noes 35
- Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Kolste, Billings, Considine, Crowley, Hebl, Hesselbein, Neubauer, Pope, Riemer, Sargent, Shankland, Sinicki, Spreitzer, C. Taylor and Zamarripa
- Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table, Ayes 60, Noes 35
- Assembly Amendment 5 adopted
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed, Ayes 59, Noes 36
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Assembly Amendment 4 adopted
On February 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Representative Edming added as a coauthor
On February 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Zimmerman
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 7, Noes 4
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 7, Noes 4
- Made a special order of business at 2:14 PM on 2-20-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 26
On February 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
- Senator Craig added as a cosponsor
On February 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Health
- Introduced by Representatives Zimmerman, Sanfelippo, Kooyenga, Ott, Duchow, Loudenbeck, Kulp, Felzkowski, Quinn and Hutton; cosponsored by Senators Stroebel and Tiffany
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (3)
February 20, 2018: Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 35
February 20, 2018: Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 35
February 20, 2018: Read a third time and passed
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 36
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor