+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On March 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On March 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On February 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On February 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On February 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Representative Spreitzer added as a coauthor
On February 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced by Representatives Goyke, Barnes, Johnson, Kessler, Ohnstad, Pope, Sinicki and Zepnick; cosponsored by Senators L. Taylor, Harris Dodd and Miller
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor