+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Published 3-28-2014
- Report approved by the Governor on 3-27-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 155
On March 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2014
On March 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 3-18-2014
On March 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Senate Amendment 1 rejected
- Read a second time
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Lassa
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 3-11-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
- Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
- Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
- Available for scheduling
On February 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and passed
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
- Read a second time
- Representative Wright added as a coauthor
On February 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 2-18-2014 by Committee on Rules
On October 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 9, Noes 0
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 9, Noes 0
On October 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On May 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On March 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Bernier
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections
- Introduced by Representatives Bernier, Murphy, Jacque, Sargent, Spiros, Berceau, Bies, Kahl, Tittl, Thiesfeldt, Hesselbein, Pridemore, LeMahieu and Stroebel; cosponsored by Senators Leibham, Lazich, Moulton, Olsen and Risser
+ − Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment 1
Senate Amendment 1 rejected
Assembly Amendment 1
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor