+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 1, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 8, Noes 0
- Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 8, Noes 0
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 8, Noes 0
On January 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On September 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Brooks
On September 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On September 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- LRB correction (Assembly Substitute Amendment 1)
On June 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Brooks
On April 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Brooks
On March 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections
- Introduced by Representatives Brooks, Knodl, Murphy, Subeck and Wichgers; cosponsored by Senators Stroebel, Bernier and Nass
+ − Amendments (3)
2019 ASA1-AB89
- Relating to: vacancies in elective offices in cities and villages.
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor