+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Published 3-31-2016
- Report approved by the Governor on 3-30-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 290
On March 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Presented to the Governor on 3-29-2016
On March 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 3-18-2016
On March 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 3-15-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
- Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
- Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
- Available for scheduling
On February 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and passed
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
- Fiscal estimate received
On February 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 2-16-2016 by Committee on Rules
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 9, Noes 2
On February 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
- Public hearing held
On February 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Health
- Introduced by Representatives Thiesfeldt and Nygren; cosponsored by Senators Vukmir and Darling