+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Published 3-31-2016
- Report approved by the Governor on 3-30-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 339
On March 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Presented to the Governor on 3-29-2016
On March 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 3-18-2016
On March 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 3-15-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Elections and Local Government, Ayes 3, Noes 2
- Executive action taken
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Elections and Local Government
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and passed
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On February 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Made a special order of business at 2:07 PM on 2-18-2016 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29
On February 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 10, Noes 3
On February 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
- Public hearing held
On February 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations
- Introduced by Representatives Vorpagel, Swearingen, Knodl, R. Brooks and A. Ott