+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Published 3-31-2016
- Report approved by the Governor on 3-30-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 313
On March 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Presented to the Governor on 3-29-2016
On March 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 3-21-2016
On March 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 3-15-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
- Public hearing held
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Health and Human Services
- Received from Assembly
On February 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
- Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
- Read a second time
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed
On February 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 2-16-2016 by Committee on Rules
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 11, Noes 0
- Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 11, Noes 0
On February 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
- Public hearing held
On February 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Rohrkaste
- Fiscal estimate received
On February 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Health
- Introduced by Representative Rohrkaste; cosponsored by Senator Moulton
+ − Amendment
2015 ASA1-AB841
- Relating to: a pilot program authorized by the Pharmacy Examining Board.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor